Vedic / Quicker / Shortcut Math ⇒ Topic : Multiplication of Three digit numbers

Maninder
 
Multiplication of a Three digit numbers
175 x 157 = ? Another Example of Multiplication of a Three digit numbers
275×354 = ? Another Example of Multiplication of a Three digit numbers
395×284 = ?  
 
Siya
 
119 x 113= 13447
149 x 158= 23542
239 x 189= 45171
349 x 258= 90042  
 
Sachin
 
102 x 108 = 11016 109 x 107 = 11663 119 x 108 = 12852  
 
Advaith
 
Ex. 1 : Solve => (1) 321 x 132 = ? (2) 4562 x 345 = ? (3) 69712 x 641 = ? Soln : (1) 321 x 132 = ? Step I. 3 2 1 1 3 2  2 as (1x2 = 2) Step II. 3 2 1 1 3 2  7 2 as (2x2+3x1 = 7) Step III. 3 2 1 1 3 2  3 7 2 as (2x3+3x2+1x1 = 13, write down 3 and carry over 1) Step IV. 3 2 1 1 3 2  2 3 7 2 as (3x3+1x2+1 = 12, write down 2 and carry over 1) Step V. 3 2 1 1 3 2  4 2 3 7 2 as (1x3+1 = 4)  
 
!! OOPS Login [Click here] is required for more results / answer