#
**Vedic / Quicker / Shortcut Math ⇒ Topic : Multiplication of Two digit numbers**

Fastest method to Multiply Two digit numbers |

David
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||

You can always use the method that we are used to in our school days to multiply any two numbers if you have sufficient time. But bank exams is all about answering maximum number of questions accurately in limited time. How efficiently you manage time depends on how well you can apply the shortcut tricks that you learnt and practiced. Here is a shortcut to multiply any 2 digit number by a 2 digit number within seconds. Let us see the steps to multiply a 2 digit number by a 2 digit number Step 1:Multiply the ten's place digit of the 1st number with ten's place digit of the 2nd number to get the ten's place digit of your answer.Step 2:Leave a blank space in between.Now multiply the unit's place digit of the 1st number with the unit's place digit of the 2nd number to get the unit's place digit of your answer.Step 3:Find the product of the inside numbers and the product of the extremes and add both and insert the digit in the blank space.
Let us consider an example to understand better
Example 1: 41 x 31=?Step 1:Multiply unit's place digit of both the numbers as shown below1 x 1=1 Step 2:Find the product of inside numbers(1 x 3=3)Find the product of extremes (4 x 1=4)
Now adding the product of inside numbers and extremes
we get, (1 x 3) + (4 x 1) = 3+4 = 7
The middle digit is 7
Step 3:Multiply ten's place digit of both the numbers as shown below4 x 3=12
Ans: 41 x 31=1271Example 2: 46 x 36=? Step 1:Multiply unit's place digit of both the numbers as shown below to get the unit's place digit which is 6 6 x 6=3
6
Here we are getting 2 digit number on multiplication, we will keep the unit's place digit and add ten's place digit(3) to step 2 Step 2:Find the product of inside numbers(6 x 3=18)Find the product of extremes (4 x 6=24)
Now adding the product of inside numbers and extremes
we get,
18+24=42
Now we shall add the ten's place digit we got from step 1.
42+3=4
5We shall keep unit's place digit and add ten's place digit(4) to
Step 3:Multiply ten's place digit of both the numbers as shown below4 x 3=12
Adding ten's place digit from step 2 we get
12+4=16
Ans: 46 x 36=1656 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||

| ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||

Gaurav
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||

Multiplication of Two digit numbers:
13 x 13 = ?
87 x 33 = ? ## Another multiplication of Two digit numbers:
17 x 19 = ? ## Another multiplication of Two digit numbers
38 x 27 = ? ## Another multiplication of Two digit numbers
59 x 42 = ? | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||

| ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||

Advaith
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||

Ex. 1 : Solve => (1) 12x13 =? (2) 17x18 =? (3) 87x92 =?
Step II. Now, do cross-multiplication, ie, multiply 3 by 1 and 1 by-2. Add the two products and write down to the left of 6.
Step III. In the last step we multiply the left-hand figures of both multiplicand and multiplier.
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||

| ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||

**!! OOPS Login [Click here] is required for more results / answer**

**Help other students, write article, leave your comments**