Vedic / Quicker / Shortcut Math ⇒ Topic : Multiply Any Number by 12

Pranav
 
To multiply any number by 12, we "Double each digit in turn and add its neighbour". For example : Step II. Step III. Step IV. The answer is 63,888. If you go through it your self you will find that the calculation goes very fast and is very easy. Practice Question Solve the following: (1)35609 X 12 (2)11123009 X 12 (3)456789 X 12 (4)22200007 X 12 (5)444890711 X 12 Ans : (1) 427308 (2) 133476108 (3) 5481468 (4) 266400084 (5) 5338688532  
 
!! OOPS Login [Click here] is required for more results / answer