Vedic / Quicker / Shortcut Math ⇒ Topic : Multiplication of Four digit numbers

Advaith
 
Ex. 1 : Solve => (1) 1234 x 5678 =? Soln : (1) 1234 x 5678 = ? Step I. Step II. Step III. Step IV. Step V. Step VI. Step VII. as (5x1 + 2 = 7, write down 7 only) Practice Question Solve the following: (1) 5712 x 4334 (2) 5156 x 4278 (3) 3899 x 4388 (4) 5666 x 9255 (5) 8137 x 1983 ANSWERS : (1) 24755808 (2) 22057368 (3) 17108812 (4) 52438830 (5) 16135671  
 
!! OOPS Login [Click here] is required for more results / answer