12 x 111 = 1332
Let us see few more examples to see how this works Example 1 : 13 x 111 = ? Step 1:Writing down unit place digit and tenth place digit with 2 blanks in between them.We get 1_ _ 3 Step 2: Adding unit place digit and tenth place digit we get 1 + 3 = 4 Inserting the sum in between the unit place digit and tenth place digit we get 1_ 4 3 Step 3: Again adding unit place digit and tenth place digit we get 1 + 3 = 4 Inserting the sum we get 1 4 4 3
13 x 111 = 1443 Example 2 : 14 x 111 = ? Step 1:Writing downunit place digit and tenth place digit with 2 blanks in between them.We get 1_ _ 4 Step 2: Adding unit place digit and tenth place digit we get 1 + 4 = 5 Inserting the sum in between the unit place digit and tenth place digit we get 1_ 5 4 Step 3: Again adding unit place digit and tenth place digit we get 1 + 4 = 5 Inserting the sum we get 1 5 5 4 14 x 111 = 1554
Now you try multiplying the following in 5 secs
(a)15 x 111 = ?
(b)16 x 111 = ?
(c)17 x 111 = ?
(d)18 x 111 = ?