Vedic / Quicker / Shortcut Math ⇒ Topic : When tens place digits are same and sum of unit place is 10

Sachin
 
You must be wondering we have learnt so many multiplication tricks for 2 digit numbers,so how is this going to be helpful.Well, Knowing new tricks and where the trick can applied to get the answer quickly can make all the difference. Condition to apply this trick is When the ten's place digit is same and the unit's place digits add up to 10 then you can apply a shortcut trick to easily multiply any 2 digit numbers. Now,let us see the steps in detail Step 1:To get the unit's place digit multiply the unit's place digit of the both the numbers. Step 2:To get the ten's place digit multiply the ten's place digit with its consecutive(next) number. Step 3:Place the result obtained in step 2 to the left of the result obtained in step 1. Let us now practice some examples Example 1: 26 x 24=? We observe that ten's place digit of both numbers=2 and by adding unit's place digit of both numbers(6+4=10)we get 10 Step 1:Multiplying the unit's place digits we get Unit's place digit=6 x 4=24 Step 2:Multiplying ten's place digit by its consecutive number we get Ten's place digit=2 x 3=6 Step 3:Placing the result of step 2 to the left of the result obtained in step 1 we get 624 Ans 26 x 24=624 Example 1: 43 x 47=? We observe that ten's place digit of both numbers=4 and by adding unit's place digit of both numbers(3+7=10)we get 10 Step 1:Multiplying the unit's place digits we get Unit's place digit=3 x 7=21 Step 2: Multiplying ten's place digit by its consecutive number we get Ten's place digit=4 x 5=20 Step 3:Placing the result of step 2 to the left of the result obtained in step 1 we get 2021 Ans 43 x 47=2021  
 
Gopal
 
94 x 96 = 9024
87 x 83 = 7221
62 x 68 = 4216
102 x 108 = 11016  
 
!! OOPS Login [Click here] is required for more results / answer